Global Patent Index - EP 1070822 A3

EP 1070822 A3 2003-06-25 - Movable wall

Title (en)

Movable wall

Title (de)

Ortsveränderbare Wand

Title (fr)

Cloison amovible

Publication

EP 1070822 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00115569 A

Priority

DE 19932892 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1070822A2] Each wall panel (11) is connected by hangers (5) to two moving gear (4) running in the track wall (2) and each panel has an arm (7) which moves in a support rail (3) mounted on the ceiling as extra stability. The arm is fixed for swivel movement on the panel and can be set by a stud (8) in a socket (10) mounted on the top profile (9) of the panel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/46; E04B 2/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/82 (2006.01); E04B 2/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/827 (2013.01); E04B 2002/7468 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070822 A2 20010124; EP 1070822 A3 20030625; DE 19932892 A1 20010208; DE 19932892 C2 20020926

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-17 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040923

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031229

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 06B 3/46 A

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04B 2/82 B

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI