Global Patent Index - EP 1070824 A3

EP 1070824 A3 2002-09-11 - Window wing, in particular of plastic material, provided with at least one pane

Title (en)

Window wing, in particular of plastic material, provided with at least one pane

Title (de)

Fensterflügel, insbesondere aus Kunststoff, mit mindestens einer in ihm angebrachten Scheibe

Title (fr)

Vantail de fenêtre, notamment en matière plastique, pourvue d'au moins une vitre

Publication

EP 1070824 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00112050 A

Priority

DE 29912768 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1070824A2] A gap between the pane and the profile on a second side of the pane is covered. The edge section of the profile (11) is positively engaged and tightly connected with a first side of a pane (12) inserted in the casement by means of a lasting adhesive mass. Out of the edge section (13) of the casement only one groove (14) is formed, which evolves stagelessly into an inner surface (15) of the profile. On a second side of the pane on its outer edge a sealing lip (18) is formed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/56; E06B 3/22; E06B 3/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/30 (2006.01); E06B 3/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/56 (2013.01); E06B 3/308 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29912768 U1 19990916; EP 1070824 A2 20010124; EP 1070824 A3 20020911; PL 341555 A1 20010129

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-07-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI