Global Patent Index - EP 1070849 A2

EP 1070849 A2 2001-01-24 - Axial flow fan

Title (en)

Axial flow fan

Title (de)

Axiallüfter

Title (fr)

Ventilateur axial

Publication

EP 1070849 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00114849 A

Priority

  • KR 19990029802 A
  • KR 19990029803 A

Abstract (en)

An axial flow fan for refrigerators is disclosed. In the axial flow fan of this invention, a hub(51) is mounted to the rotating shaft of a drive motor, with a plurality of blades(55) regularly fixed around the hub(51). A variety of designing factors of the blades, such as the number of blades, hub ratio, sweep angle, pitch angle and maximum camber ratio, are optimally designed to allow a smooth flow of cool air agreeable with both the large pressure loss and complex flow passage of refrigerators while accomplishing a reduction in air flow noise of the refrigerators. A vortex prevention means is provided on the concave back surface of the annular rim formed of the shroud for preventing discharged air from forming a vortex stream in back of the fan. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/32; F04D 29/38; F04D 29/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/32 (2006.01); F04D 29/38 (2006.01); F04D 29/54 (2006.01); F04D 29/66 (2006.01); F25D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/547 (2013.01); F04D 29/325 (2013.01); F04D 29/384 (2013.01); F04D 29/666 (2013.01); F25D 2317/0681 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070849 A2 20010124; EP 1070849 A3 20020717; EP 1070849 B1 20100324; DE 60044049 D1 20100506; JP 2001059499 A 20010306; JP 3469857 B2 20031125

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-03-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160711

2017-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60044049

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150710

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150612

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150615

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20101228

2010-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60044049 P 20100506

2010-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2010-03-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2009-11-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LG ELECTRONICS, INC.

2007-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070131

2003-04-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04D 29/32 A, 7F 04D 29/38 B, 7F 04D 29/66 B, 7F 04D 29/54 B, 7F 04D 19/00 B

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI