Global Patent Index - EP 1070854 A2

EP 1070854 A2 2001-01-24 - Multiway valve

Title (en)

Multiway valve

Title (de)

Wegeventil

Title (fr)

Distributeur

Publication

EP 1070854 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00250229 A

Priority

DE 19934053 A

Abstract (en)

This invention relates to a multiway valve for controlling the flow of a pressure medium from a fluid supply conduit or an exhaust conduit to a fluid delivery conduit comprising a valve housing (1) with a substantially cylindrical axial hole which has a plurality of annular steps (9) forming inner chambers with corresponding outer ports (2, 3a, 3b, 4a, 4b) for connecting said conduits, means for switching the fluid flow between said ports (2, 3a, 3b, 4a, 4b) guided axially movable in said hole and means for moving said switching means relative to said valve housing (1) disposed on at least one end of said switching means. According to the invention said steps (9) form at least two inner chambers for the delivery port (3a, 3b) and also at least two inner chambers for the exhaust port (4a, 4b). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16K 31/122 (2006.01); F15B 13/04 (2006.01); F16K 11/07 (2006.01); F16K 31/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/0402 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070854 A2 20010124; EP 1070854 A3 20030709; DE 19934053 A1 20010201; DE 19934053 C2 20021212; JP 2001050406 A 20010223

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040110

2004-05-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOSCH REXROTH TEKNIK AB

2001-04-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AB REXROTH MECMAN

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI