Global Patent Index - EP 1070855 A1

EP 1070855 A1 2001-01-24 - Actuator with an extruded cylinder barrel

Title (en)

Actuator with an extruded cylinder barrel

Title (de)

Aktuator mit einem extrudierten Rohrkörper

Title (fr)

Vérin avec un corps de cylindre profilé

Publication

EP 1070855 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00202619 A

Priority

NL 1012653 A

Abstract (en)

The actuator has an extruded tubular body. The tube has a sliding guide sector (14) extending in the longitudinal direction. The locking device (16, 17) is in the form of a slide which can be moved along the guide sector between a position for the insertion or removal of the fluid line fitting (12, 13) and a position in which the fitting is locked in place.

Abstract (de)

Von einem Druckmedium betätigbarer Aktuator (1), umfassend einen extrudierten Rohrkörper (2), der an dessen Enden mit Endstücken (3,4), die den Rohrkörper abschließen, versehen ist, wobei in dem Rohrkörper (2) zwischen den Endstücken (3,4) ein Arbeitsraum (5) begrenzt ist, in dem ein Kolben (6) hin und her beweglich ist, wobei das Aktuatorrohr weiter mit zumindestens einer Anschlußbohrung (10,11), die mit dem Arbeitsraum (5) in Verbindung steht, versehen ist, welche Anschlußbohrung (10,11) zum Aufnehmen eines Fittings (12,13) einer Druckmediumleitung dient, und wobei der Aktuator (1) bei jeder Anschlußbohrung (10,11) mit einem zugehörigen Sicherungsmittel (16,17) zum Befestigen des Fittings (12,13) der Druckmediumleitung in der Anschlußbohrung (10,11) versehen ist. Das extrudierte Rohr ist bei der Extrusion mit einem sich in Längsrichtung erstreckenden Gleitführungsabschnitt (14,15) versehen. Das Sicherungsmittel (16,17) ist als ein Schieber, der verschiebbar am Gleitführungsabschnitt (14,15) angeordnet ist, ausgeführt, wobei der Schieber (16,17) verschiebbar ist zwischen einer Lage, in der das Fitting (12,13) der Druckmediumleitung in die Anschlußbohrung (10,11) hineingesteckt oder herausgenommen werden kann, und einer Lage, in der der Schieber (16,17) in solcher Weise mit dem Fitting (12,13) der Druckmediumleitung zusammenwirkt, daß diese gegen ein Herausziehen aus der Anschlußbohrung (10,11) gesichert ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 15/14; F15B 15/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/14 (2006.01); F15B 15/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/1428 (2013.01); F15B 15/149 (2013.01); F15B 15/2892 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070855 A1 20010124; EP 1070855 B1 20060607; AT 329159 T 20060615; DE 50012890 D1 20060720; NL 1012653 C2 20010123

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-12 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2013-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130729

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-09-26 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Document: DE 50012890

- Effective date: 20130926

2013-07-15 [REG AT MA03] REVOCATION OF THE PATENT

- Document: AT 329159 T

- Effective date: 20121223

2013-05-01 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20121223

2013-05-01 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20121223

2013-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120726

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120731

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120726

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-23 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 50012890

2012-12-23 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 50012890

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120625

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HOERBIGER AUTOMATISIERUNGSTECHNIK HOLDING GMBH

2009-11-25 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: HOERBIGER AUTOMATISIERUNGSTECHNIK HOLDING GMBH

- Effective date: 20070307

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060607

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060720

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060908

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ACTUANT CORP.

- Effective date: 20060731

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060720

2007-06-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HOERBIGER AUTOMATISIERUNGSTECHNIK HOLDING GMBH

2007-04-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HOERBIGER AUTOMATISIERUNGSTECHNIK HOLDING GMBH

- Effective date: 20070307

2007-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-01-10 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-12-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-07 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061107

2006-10-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060907

2006-09-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060918

2006-09-07 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060907

2006-09-05 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012890 P 20060720

2006-07-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-06-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-06-07 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060607

2006-06-07 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060607

2006-06-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060607

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030930

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ACTUANT CORPORATION

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010115

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI