Global Patent Index - EP 1070908 A1

EP 1070908 A1 2001-01-24 - Device for filling a car tank

Title (en)

Device for filling a car tank

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Wagenbehälterfüllung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de remplissage d'un réservoir de véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1070908 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402076 A

Priority

FR 9909475 A

Abstract (en)

The fuel tank filler consists of a housing with a passage (20) through it to allow liquefied gas fuel to pass into the tank, and a mobile shutter (7) to cut off the flow when the tank is full. The shutter has an elastic seal (53) which interacts with a chamfered surface (210) inside the housing when in its lower position. The position of the shutter is controlled by a cam (9) on the end of an arm connected to a float (8) which floats on the surface of the fuel in the tank.

Abstract (fr)

Dispositif de remplissage d'un réservoir de carburant d'un véhicule automobile comportant un corps de passage (2), des moyens d'admission et d'arrêt (3, 5, 6, 7, 51, 53) ainsi que des moyens mobiles limiteurs de remplissage (8, 9, 10), caractérisé en ce que lesdits moyens d'admission et d'arrêt (3, 5, 6, 7, 51, 53) comportent un moyen élastique (53) destiné à se déformer pour occuper un moyen de réception (211), situé dans ledit corps de passage (2), lorsque lesdits moyens mobiles limiteurs de remplissage (8, 9), ont atteint une position extrême prédéterminée. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F17C 13/12; F16K 31/20; F17C 5/02; F17C 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16K 31/20 (2006.01); F17C 5/02 (2006.01); F17C 13/04 (2006.01); F17C 13/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F17C 13/123 (2013.01); F16K 31/20 (2013.01); F17C 5/02 (2013.01); F17C 13/04 (2013.01); F17C 2250/0413 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070908 A1 20010124; FR 2796704 A1 20010126; FR 2796704 B1 20010831

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-29 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20090316

2006-12-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061122

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RENAULT S.A.S.

2001-11-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE IT

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010724

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE IT

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI