Global patent index - EP 1070910 A2

EP 1070910 A2 2001-01-24 - Wall-mountable lighting apparatus

Title (en)

Wall-mountable lighting apparatus

Title (de)

Wandleuchte

Title (fr)

Appareil d'éclairage mural

Publication

EP 1070910 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00202561 A

Priority

IT MI990473 U

Abstract (en)

A wall-mountable lighting apparatus comprises a casing (11), inside which at least one light source (12) is present, and is provided with a screen (15) set between the light source (12) and the wall (14), the screen (15) having a portion adjacent to the wall (14), provided with at least one area (16) designed to diffuse the light. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/00 (2006.01); F21V 3/00 (2006.01); F21V 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/033 (2013.01); F21V 3/00 (2013.01); F21V 5/00 (2013.01); F21W 2131/107 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070910 A2 20010124; EP 1070910 A3 20030416; IT 246871 Y1 20020410; IT MI990473 U1 20010123; IT MI990473 V0 19990723; NO 20003756 A 20010124; NO 20003756 D0 20000721

INPADOC legal status

2004-09-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040223

2004-01-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI