Global Patent Index - EP 1070925 A1

EP 1070925 A1 2001-01-24 - Automatic refrigeration apparatus with defrost control

Title (en)

Automatic refrigeration apparatus with defrost control

Title (de)

Automatisches Kältegerät mit Abtausteuerung

Title (fr)

Appareil frigorifique automatique avec commande de dégivrage

Publication

EP 1070925 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00112357 A

Priority

IT PN990062 A

Abstract (en)

The refrigeration apparatus comprises a refrigeration circuit governed by control means (17) to cool down a compartment (4) that is accessible through a door (22). Said control means are driven by a plurality of sensors (12-16) and are in turn adapted to drive the functional component parts (6, 9, 10) of the apparatus in view of carrying out evaporator (7) defrost phases. The control means (17) determine the beginning of said defrost phases according to a first or a second mode of operation when a condition in which the door (22) is substantially opened or is substantially closed, respectively, is detected. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 21/00 (2006.01); F25D 21/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 21/006 (2013.01); F25B 2700/2116 (2013.01); F25B 2700/2117 (2013.01); F25D 21/08 (2013.01); F25D 2700/02 (2013.01); F25D 2700/12 (2013.01); F25D 2700/14 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070925 A1 20010124; EP 1070925 B1 20040901; DE 60013374 D1 20041007; DE 60013374 T2 20050224; IT 1311702 B1 20020319; IT PN990062 A1 20010122; IT PN990062 D0 19990720

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-08-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-07-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60013374 P 20041007

2004-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-09-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-03-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: AUTOMATIC REFRIGERATION APPARATUS WITH DEFROST CONTROL

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030331

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010417

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI