Global Patent Index - EP 1070929 A2

EP 1070929 A2 2001-01-24 - Automotive air conditioning system evaporator

Title (en)

Automotive air conditioning system evaporator

Title (de)

Verdampfer für Kraftfahrzeug-Klimaanlage

Title (fr)

Evaporateur pour système de conditionnement d'air pour véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1070929 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00115565 A

Priority

DE 19933913 A

Abstract (en)

The invention concerns an automotive air conditioning system evaporator (2) with an extended collector (4), whose collector cover is rounded for stability under pressure, divided internally across the collector into a first and a second compartment (8, 10), which are associated with an inlet and outlet for the evaporator coolant, and which exhibits divided transverse slots along its length, common to both compartments, in which is provided a flat pipe array (20), constructed for dual flow as a minimum, linked with each other by means of zigzag fins for the purpose of heat transfer, whose ends are at any given time inserted into a transverse slot in the collector cover in such a way, that one flow (22) in the flat pipes communicates with one compartment and the other flow (24) in the flat pipes (20) communicates with the other compartment. The invention provides for the first or second wall (32, 34) of both compartments (8, 10) formed by the collector cover at any given time to be configured as a rounded tube for pressure stability. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 9/02; F28D 1/053

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/053 (2006.01); F28F 1/02 (2006.01); F28F 9/02 (2006.01); F28F 9/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 1/022 (2013.01); F28D 1/05391 (2013.01); F28F 9/0214 (2013.01); F28F 9/262 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0085 (2013.01); F28F 2225/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070929 A2 20010124; EP 1070929 A3 20011114; EP 1070929 A4 20010924; EP 1070929 B1 20090107; DE 19933913 A1 20010201; DE 19933913 C2 20030717; ES 2319610 T3 20090511

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-12-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091008

2009-05-11 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2319610 T3

2009-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT

2002-10-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020815

2002-09-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: ES FR IT

2002-07-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020506

2001-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI