Global Patent Index - EP 1070932 A1

EP 1070932 A1 2001-01-24 - Device to help loading a gun having a screw thread breech mechanism

Title (en)

Device to help loading a gun having a screw thread breech mechanism

Title (de)

Hilfsvorrichtung zur Ladung einer Kanone mit Schraubverschluss

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'aide au chargement d'une arme dotée d'une culasse à vis

Publication

EP 1070932 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401964 A

Priority

FR 9909498 A

Abstract (en)

The loading feed for a screw breech firearm has a receiving frame (2) to hold a shell (35) and move it to an aligned position with the breech. The frame has a setting feed (8) for the breech and a guide (17) for the shell in the breech. The frame has a guard (16) at one end to engage the barrel seating cone.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne Un dispositif d'aide au chargement 1 d'un obus 35 dans la chambre du canon d'une arme équipée d'une culasse à vis 23 comportant une civière 2 de réception sur laquelle l'obus est positionné, permettant de l'amener d'une position de mise en place à une position de chargement dans laquelle l'obus est aligné avec l'axe du canon, un moyen de refoulement 8 et un moyen de coincement 17 de l'obus dans le canon opérant successivement, le moyen de refoulement et le moyen de coincement étant solidaires de la civière 2, la civière étant reliée à la glissière de l'arme de manière articulée pour faire passer l'obus de la position de mise en place à la position de chargement, le moyen de coincement 17 étant relié de manière articulée par rapport à la civière 2 de telle façon qu'après refoulement de l'obus 35 ce moyen de coincement s'engage partiellement dans la civière 2 sensiblement dans l'axe du canon, la civière étant engagée dans la culasse 23 de l'arme en butée contre un cône d'étanchéité 36 du canon. La civière 2 est munie au niveau de son extrémité avant d'un moyen de protection 16 venant en butée contre le cône d'étanchéité 36. Le moyen de protection est monté de manière élastique par rapport à la civière 2 pour éliminer les écarts éventuels de distance entre la culasse et la civière. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 9/14; F41A 9/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 9/14 (2006.01); F41A 9/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 9/14 (2013.01); F41A 9/42 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070932 A1 20010124; EP 1070932 B1 20021204; AT 229165 T 20021215; DE 60000901 D1 20030116; DE 60000901 T2 20030918; DK 1070932 T3 20030324; ES 2188488 T3 20030701; FR 2796713 A1 20010126; FR 2796713 B1 20020913; US 6457397 B1 20021001; ZA 200003601 B 20010226

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-21 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: NEXTER SYTEMS

- Effective date: 20160315

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100707

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090629

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-07-22 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090625 AND 20090701

2009-01-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080206

2008-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-03-25 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2006-06-26 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20060626

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-06-26 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20060626

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GIAT INDUSTRIES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-08-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1070932E

2003-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-07 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030707

2003-07-07 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030707

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2188488 T3

2003-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-03-24 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-03-05 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-02-27 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030400199

2003-02-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030127

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000901 20030116

2003-01-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 229165 T 20021215

2001-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010903

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010221

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GUESNET, DOMINIQUE

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: THEBAULT, DIDIER

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LAMURE, GILLES

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: POLLET, FRANCK

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI