Global Patent Index - EP 1070963 A3

EP 1070963 A3 2002-09-18 - Rinsing tray

Title (en)

Rinsing tray

Title (de)

Spülwannensystem

Title (fr)

Bac de rinçage

Publication

EP 1070963 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00112838 A

Priority

DE 19934090 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1070963A2] Projections extend into the internal space of an upper tank (1.2) and comprise through holes which have the same matrix dimensions as the pipette tips. A lower tank (2.2) has at least one supply inlet for continuously filling it with rinsing liquid. The upper tank includes at least one outlet (9).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 35/10; B01L 11/00; B08B 3/00; B08B 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 11/00 (2006.01); B01L 99/00 (2010.01); B08B 3/04 (2006.01); B08B 9/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/04 (2013.01); B01L 99/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070963 A2 20010124; EP 1070963 A3 20020918; EP 1070963 B1 20081119; DE 19934090 A1 20010208; DE 50015451 D1 20090102; JP 2001054772 A 20010227; US 6475444 B1 20021105

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160617

2017-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160617

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150618

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-10-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090820

2009-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50015451 P 20090102

2008-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2008-11-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-12-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071127

2005-03-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CYBIO AG

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030307

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 01N 35/10 A, 7B 08B 3/00 B, 7B 01L 11/00 B, 7B 08B 3/04 B

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI