Global Patent Index - EP 1070992 A2

EP 1070992 A2 2001-01-24 - In-line color electrophotographic printer

Title (en)

In-line color electrophotographic printer

Title (de)

Elektrophotographischer Farbzeilendrucker

Title (fr)

Imprimante électrophotographique par ligne couleur

Publication

EP 1070992 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00123004 A

Priority

  • EP 96106852 A
  • US 45501195 A

Abstract (en)

A single pass EP color printer includes a photoreceptor web (146) having multiple layers and including a charge transport layer and a charge generation layer. Four exposure devices (148,150,152,154) (e.g. either laser-based or thin film electroluminescent edge emitting (TFEL) devices) are serially arrayed along the photoreceptor web (146) and act to expose the photoreceptor web (146) in accordance with cyan, magenta, yellow and black color image pixel data. A toner developer module (130,132,134,136) is associated with each exposure device (148,150,152,154) and includes a toner reservoir, a developer roll (138) for carrying the toner to a transfer point. Each developer module (148) is fixed so as to position its developer roll (138) at a constant prescribed distance from the photoreceptor web (146) at the toner transfer point. Erasure devices (158) and charging devices (156) are positioned between the respective developer modules to enable preparation of the photoreceptor web for a subsequent exposure/development operation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/525 (2006.01); G03G 15/01 (2006.01); G03G 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/0152 (2013.01); G03G 15/0157 (2013.01); G03G 15/0168 (2013.01); G03G 2215/017 (2013.01); G03G 2215/021 (2013.01); G03G 2215/0497 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 5557377 A 19960917; DE 69637386 D1 20080214; DE 69637386 T2 20090129; DE 69637475 D1 20080508; DE 69637475 T2 20090416; EP 0745909 A2 19961204; EP 0745909 A3 19981209; EP 0745909 B1 20080102; EP 1070992 A2 20010124; EP 1070992 A3 20020821; EP 1070992 B1 20080326; JP H096081 A 19970110

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2014-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20131231

2013-02-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69637475

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-12-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120503

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-04-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120329 AND 20120404

2012-04-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO., L.P., US

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69637475

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-04-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69637475

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: SCHOPPE, ZIMMERMANN, STOECKELER, ZINKLER & PAR, DE

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-02-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69637475

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: SCHOPPE, ZIMMERMANN, STOECKELER, ZINKLER & PAR, DE

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110426

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110427

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-03-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20081230

2008-11-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2008-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69637475

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-05-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-03-26 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 0745909

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-03-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-05-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20021023

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LOEWEN, VICTOR D.

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CAMIS, THOMAS

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LINDBLOM, KENNETH A.

2001-01-24 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 745909

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB