Global patent index - EP 1070996 A1

EP 1070996 A1 2001-01-24 - Timepiece with date display

Title (en)

Timepiece with date display

Title (de)

Uhr mit Datumsanzeige

Title (fr)

Pièce d'horlogerie à affichage du quantième

Publication

EP 1070996 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00810582 A

Priority

FR 9909425 A

Abstract (en)

Clockwork comprises two disks (14, 16) rotating around their centers (22, 24). Upper disk (16) is transparent, and carries numbers forming units of the date. Lower disk (14) carries numbers forming tens of the date. Clockwork also comprises driving mechanism so that disks rotate, and display correct date. Axis of rotation of disks are separated by distance equals to r(1) + r(2) - 2 asterisk e, where r(1) and r(2) are disks radii, and e is width of list of numbers.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne une pièce d'horlogerie à affichage du quantième, qui est caractérisée en ce qu'elle comporte: deux disques rotatifs (14, 16) au moins partiellement superposés, le disque supérieur (16) étant transparent, qui portent respectivement, régulièrement répartis sur un anneau périphérique, la série des signes formant les unités du quantième et la série des signes formant les dizaines et qui coopèrent pour présenter lesdits signes en juxtaposition, et un mécanisme d'entraînement desdits disques en rotation de manière à ce que lesdits signes juxtaposés fournissent une indication du quantième (30). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 19/247

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/247 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/247 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070996 A1 20010124; EP 1070996 B1 20061129; FR 2796732 A1 20010126; FR 2796732 B1 20011102

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150717

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-01-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SOWIND S.A., CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2010-04-30 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2010-02-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SOWIND S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2007-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070830

2007-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: GLN GRESSET & LAESSER NEUCHATEL CABINET DE CONSEIL

2006-12-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2006-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH FR LI

2001-11-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH FR LI

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH FR LI

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI