Global patent index - EP 1070999 A1

EP 1070999 A1 2001-01-24 - Method for shaping the surface of clockwork pieces

Title (en)

Method for shaping the surface of clockwork pieces

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Oberflächengestaltung von Uhrwerkteilen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour façonner la surface de parties de mouvement d'horlogerie

Publication

EP 1070999 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00810650 A

Priority

  • EP 00810650 A
  • EP 99810665 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves applying a film-forming lacquer to the timepiece component by electrophoresis to create a closed coating. Selective local removal or alteration of the coating forms a mask for use in a surface structuring method. Prior to application of the film-forming material, the component is preferably cleaned in an ultrasonic bath, chemically deoxidised, cathodically degreased. The surface is then neutralised and activated. An Independent claim is included for clock components such as a decorative inscription.

Abstract (de)

Die qualitativ äusserst anspruchsvollen und mit einer Auflösung im Mikrometerbereich auszuführenden Verzierungen und anderen Oberflächengestaltungen auch von komplizierten Uhrwerkteilen können hergestellt werden, indem die Uhrwerkteile mit einer zuverlässig vollständig geschlossenen Abdeckung durch elektrophoretische Abscheidung eines filmbildenden Materials überzogen werden. An den zu gestaltenden Oberflächenabschnitten wird die Abdeckung gezielt mittels bildgebender Verfahren, die ein lichtempfindliches Abdeckungsmaterial voraussetzen, und/oder durch direkte Einwirkung, z. B. durch Laser, freigelegt. An den freigelegten Partien wird mit chemischen und physikalischen Verfahren ein Materialabtrag (Ätzen, Elektrolyse) oder Materialauftrag (Abscheidung) aus der Dampfphase nach chemischen oder physikalischen Prinzipien durchgeführt. Während bei komplizierten Uhrwerkteilen, insbesondere mit Schraubenlöchern kleinen und kleinsten Durchmessers, die Ausbildung der geschlossenen Abdeckung nur durch Elektrophorese möglich ist, ist bei Uhrwerkteilen mit dreidimensional einfach geformten, geschlossenen Oberflächen auch die Ausbildung der Abdeckung nach bekannten Verfahren, z. B. durch Eintauchen, erhältlich. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04D 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04D 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04D 3/0069 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0326655 A1 19890809 - SHIPLEY CO [US]

Citation (search report)

  • [XAY] CH 332199 A 19580831 - MONNIER RAYMOND [CH]
  • [X] US 2594820 A 19520429 - CHARLES STERN
  • [Y] US 5702583 A 19971230 - RISCHKE JORG WERNER [NL], et al
  • [Y] CH 358657 A 19611130 - MICHAUD JEAN [CH], et al
  • [A] EP 0326655 A1 19890809 - SHIPLEY CO [US]
  • [A] CH 345850 A 19600415 - LAPIDOR SA [CH]
  • [A] CH 394956 A 19650315 - METALEM SA [CH]
  • [A] GB 1014236 A 19651222 - ANDRE KNEUSS, et al
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 114 (C - 166) 18 May 1983 (1983-05-18)
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 8728, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A14, AN 1987-195332, XP002122484
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 8614, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class M11, AN 1986-091393, XP002122485
  • [A] LAVIOLETTE J: "Manuel de fabrications de micromécanique", 1964, SCRIPTAR, LAUSANNE, XP002122483
  • [A] GEORG SCHINDLER: "Laserstrahlen in der Uhrenfertigung", NEUE UHRMACHER-ZEITUNG, vol. 18, 12 October 1973 (1973-10-12), pages 38 - 40, XP002122481
  • [A] RYUZO OKAMOTO ET AL: "Application of the ion-based surface treatment technique to the watch exterior", BULLETIN ANNUEL DE LA SOCIETÉ SUISSE DE CHRONOMÉTRIE, vol. 10, 1981, Neuchâtel Switzerland, pages 163 - 169, XP002122482

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1071000 A1 20010124; DK 1070999 T3 20121001; EP 1070999 A1 20010124; EP 1070999 B1 20120627; HK 1034580 A1 20130328

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160714

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160714

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160713

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150722

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120720

2013-07-25 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Ref Legal Event Code: R097

- Ref Document Number: 50016240

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130328

2013-06-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20130328

2013-05-08 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2013-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121008

2013-03-28 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: GR

- Ref Document Number: 1034580

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2013-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121029

2013-02-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120627

2013-01-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120627

2012-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120928

2012-10-10 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2012-10-09 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2012-10-01 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2012-08-16 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R096

- Ref Document Number: 50016240

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120816

2012-07-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2012-07-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 564525

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20120715

2012-06-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2012-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2012-06-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: SI

2012-06-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070410

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-10 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20010714

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010714

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI