Global Patent Index - EP 1071000 A1

EP 1071000 A1 2001-01-24 - Method for shaping surfaces of parts of watch

Title (en)

Method for shaping surfaces of parts of watch

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Oberflächengestaltung von Uhrwerkteilen

Title (fr)

Méthode pour la conformation de surfaces de parties de montre

Publication

EP 1071000 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810665 A

Priority

EP 99810665 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves applying a closed coating of film-forming material, especially lacquer, to the timepiece component by electrophoresis, to form a mask by selective local remove or alteration of the coating. Prior to application of the film-forming material, the component is preferably cleaned in an ultrasonic bath, chemically deoxidised, cathodically degreased. The surface is then neutralised and activated. An Independent claim is included for timepiece components in the form of decorative inscriptions.

Abstract (de)

Die qualitativ äusserst anspruchsvollen und mit einer Auflösung im Mikrometerbereich auszuführenden Verzierungen und anderen Oberflächengestaltungen auch von komplizierten Uhrwerkteilen können hergestellt werden, indem die Uhrwerkteile mit einer zuverlässig vollständig geschlossenen Abdeckung durch elektrophoretische Abscheidung eines filmbildenden Materials überzogen werden. An den zu gestaltenden Oberflächenabschnitten wird die Abdeckung gezielt mittels bildgebender Verfahren, die ein lichtempfindliches Abdeckungsmaterial voraussetzen, und/oder durch direkte Einwirkung, z. B. durch Laser, freigelegt. An den freigelegten Partien wird mit chemischen und physikalischen Verfahren ein Materialabtrag (Ätzen, Elektrolyse) oder Materialauftrag (Abscheidung) aus der Dampfphase nach chemischen oder physikalischen Prinzipien durchgeführt. Während bei komplizierten Uhrwerkteilen, insbesondere mit Schraubenlöchern kleinen und kleinsten Durchmessers, die Ausbildung der geschlossenen Abdeckung nur durch Elektrophorese möglich ist, ist bei Uhrwerkteilen mit dreidimensional einfach geformten, geschlossenen Oberflächen auch die Ausbildung der Abdeckung nach bekannten Verfahren, z. B. durch Eintauchen, erhältlich.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04D 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04D 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04D 3/0069 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XAY] CH 332199 A 19580831 - MONNIER RAYMOND [CH]
  • [X] US 2594820 A 19520429 - CHARLES STERN
  • [Y] US 5702583 A 19971230 - RISCHKE JORG WERNER [NL], et al
  • [Y] CH 358657 A 19611130 - MICHAUD JEAN [CH], et al
  • [A] EP 0326655 A1 19890809 - SHIPLEY CO [US]
  • [A] CH 394956 A 19650315 - METALEM SA [CH]
  • [A] CH 345850 A 19600415 - LAPIDOR SA [CH]
  • [A] GB 1014236 A 19651222 - ANDRE KNEUSS, et al
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 114 (C - 166) 18 May 1983 (1983-05-18)
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 8728, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A14, AN 1987-195332, XP002122484
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 8614, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class M11, AN 1986-091393, XP002122485
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 194 (C - 358) 8 July 1986 (1986-07-08)
  • [A] LAVIOLETTE J: "Manuel de fabrications de micromécanique", 1964, SCRIPTAR, LAUSANNE, XP002122483
  • [A] GEORG SCHINDLER: "Laserstrahlen in der Uhrenfertigung", NEUE UHRMACHER-ZEITUNG, vol. 18, 12 October 1973 (1973-10-12), pages 38 - 40, XP002122481
  • [A] RYUZO OKAMOTO ET AL: "Application of the ion-based surface treatment technique to the watch exterior", BULLETIN ANNUEL DE LA SOCIETÉ SUISSE DE CHRONOMÉTRIE, vol. 10, 1981, Neuchâtel Switzerland, pages 163 - 169, XP002122482

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1071000 A1 20010124; DK 1070999 T3 20121001; EP 1070999 A1 20010124; EP 1070999 B1 20120627; HK 1034580 A1 20130328

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010725

2001-11-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI