Global Patent Index - EP 1071056 A3

EP 1071056 A3 2001-04-25 - Method for wireless information transmission between a vehicle internal terminal and a central computer

Title (en)

Method for wireless information transmission between a vehicle internal terminal and a central computer

Title (de)

Verfahren zur drahtlosen Übertragung von Nachrichten zwischen einem fahrzeuginternen Kommunikationssytem und einem fahrzeuexternen Zentralrechner

Title (fr)

Méthode pour la transmission sans fil d'informations entre un terminal interne d'un véhicule et un ordinateur central

Publication

EP 1071056 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00112123 A

Priority

DE 19933318 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1071056A2] The internal communication system of a vehicle includes an audio output unit for reproducing a received message. The central computer, external to the vehicle, converts a message from text form to a phonetic representation and transmits it in this form to the communication system. The communication system converts the phonetic representation into speech for output via the audio output unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/00; G10L 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 16/02 (2006.01); B60R 16/023 (2006.01); G06F 3/16 (2006.01); G08G 1/09 (2006.01); G10L 13/00 (2006.01); G10L 13/08 (2013.01); H04B 7/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 13/08 (2013.01); G08G 1/092 (2013.01); G08G 1/091 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1071056 A2 20010124; EP 1071056 A3 20010425; EP 1071056 B1 20051116; DE 19933318 C1 20010201; DE 50011607 D1 20051222; JP 2001069071 A 20010316; JP 4845249 B2 20111228; US 7243067 B1 20070710

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120606

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-04-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50011607

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-03-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120607

2013-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120606

2013-01-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110727

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110720

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110630

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110613

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-10-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060817

2006-06-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-12-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011607 P 20051222

2005-12-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2005-11-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2005-11-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040518

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB SE

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010518

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI