Global Patent Index - EP 1071057 A1

EP 1071057 A1 2001-01-24 - Method and device for traffic condition prognosis by cascading state feedback

Title (en)

Method and device for traffic condition prognosis by cascading state feedback

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verkehrszustandsprognose durch rückgekoppelte Zustandskaskade

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de pronostic de l'état du trafic par retroaction l'état en cascade

Publication

EP 1071057 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00250248 A

Priority

DE 19935769 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves detecting spatially and/or temporally incomplete data relating to the state of the traffic network up until the creation point of the forecast. The gaps in the data are filled using a representative traffic model to generate simulated replacement data. Replacement data are generated from the traffic model for future time points. A forecast is made of the state of the traffic network at a future a time point based on the existing data and replacement data. An Independent claim is included for an apparatus for carrying out the method.

Abstract (de)

Eine qualitativ hochwertige Erzeugung von Verkehrsprognosen aus zeitlich und/oder örtlich lückenhaft vorliegenden Meßdaten wird ermöglicht durch eine Vorrichtung und ein Verfahren zur Erstellung einer Verkehrsprognose für einen Prognosezeitpunkt aus den Zustand eines Verkehrsnetzes betreffenden Meßdaten in einer Verkehrszentrale, wobei zu mehreren Meßorten im Verkehrsnetz mehrere Zeitpunkte innerhalb eines sich ab dem Prognose-Erstellungs-Zeitpunkt zeitlich rückwärts erstreckenden Zeitraumes betreffende, räumlich und/oder zeitlich lückenhafte Meßdaten zum Zustand des Verkehrsnetzes an den Meßorten erfaßt werden, wobei unter Berücksichtigung des zeitlichen Werte-Verlaufs mehrerer zu diesen Zeitpunkten erfaßter Meßdaten mit zeitlich-räumliche Entwicklungen im Verkehrsnetz repräsentierenden Verkehrsmodellen zeitlich und/oder räumlich die Meßdaten-Lücken auffüllende, Meßdaten simulierende Ersatzdaten generiert werden, und mit den Verkehrsmodellen für gegenüber dem Prognose-Erstellungs-Zeitpunkt künftige, jedoch vor dem Prognosezeitpunkt liegende Zeitpunkte ebenfalls Ersatzdaten generiert werden, worauf eine Prognose von den Zustand des Verkehrsnetzes zu einem gegenüber dem Prognose-Erstellungs-Zeitpunkt künftigen Prognosezeitpunkt an Orten des Verkehrsnetzes repräsentierenden Ortszustandsdaten erstellt wird aufgrund der für Zeitpunkte vor dem Prognose-Erstellungs-Zeitpunkt vorliegenden Meßdaten und Ersatzdaten und der für Zeitpunkte nach dem Prognose-Erstellungs-Zeitpunkt vorliegenden Ersatzdaten. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/0104 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] EP 0902405 A2 19990317 - SIEMENS AG [DE]
  • [Y] DE 19737440 A1 19980827 - MANNESMANN AG [DE]
  • [Y] US 5684475 A 19971104 - KRAUSE BERNHARD [DE], et al
  • [Y] EP 0921509 A2 19990609 - NAVIGATION TECH CORP [US]
  • [Y] KERNER B S ET AL: "STRUCTURE AND PARAMETERS OF CLUSTER IN TRAFFIC FLOW", PHYSICAL REVIEW E. STATISTICAL PHYSICS, PLASMAS, FLUIDS, AND RELATED INTERDISCIPLINARY TOPICS,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, NEW YORK, NY,US, vol. 50, no. 1, July 1994 (1994-07-01), pages 54 - 83, XP000874333, ISSN: 1063-651X

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1071057 A1 20010124; EP 1071057 B1 20070502; AT 361516 T 20070515; DE 19935769 A1 20010201; DE 19935769 C2 20020207; DE 50014288 D1 20070614; ES 2286981 T3 20071216

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170818

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-09-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070720

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070502

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070803

2008-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-04-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080205

2008-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070502

2008-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070502

2008-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071002

2007-12-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2007-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2286981 T3

2007-09-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP

2007-09-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-08-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070802

2007-06-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014288 P 20070614

2007-06-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2007-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-05-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070502

2007-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-05-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-05-02 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070502

2007-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BECKER, MARKUS DIPL.-PHYS. DR. RER, NAT.

2007-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FASTENRATH, ULRICH DIPL.-PHYS. DR. RER, NAT.

2007-01-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BECKER, MARKUS DIPL.-PHYS. DR.

2007-01-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FASTENRATH, ULRICH DIPL.-PHYS. DR.

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010129

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI