Global Patent Index - EP 1071059 A1

EP 1071059 A1 2001-01-24 - Signaling device, in particular for roads

Title (en)

Signaling device, in particular for roads

Title (de)

Signaleinrichtung, insbesondere für Strassen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de signalisation, notamment routière

Publication

EP 1071059 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00490032 A

Priority

FR 9909754 A

Abstract (en)

The signaling system (1) uses sensors for exterior parameters and signal communication device, containing control data function of exterior parameters. Processor is designed to operate warning signal transmitter as function of control signal and transmission signal data received by device, and/or to establish communication signals designed to be transmitted by device. Independent claims are also included for the group of signaling systems interacting together and driveway with a group of signaling systems fitted.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un dispositif de signalisation, notamment routière, fluviale, aéronautique ou autre, constitué au moins d'un plot (1), comprenant au moins des moyens de détection de paramètres extérieurs et/ou des moyens d'émission de signaux d'avertissement (24), relatifs audits paramètres extérieurs. Selon l'invention, ledit dispositif comprend en outre : des moyens d'échange avec l'extérieur de signaux, dits de communication, contenant au moins des informations, dites de commande, dont la nature est fonction desdits paramètres extérieurs, des moyens de traitement, aptes à faire fonctionner lesdits moyens (3) d'émission de signaux d'avertissement en fonction au moins des informations de commande des signaux de communication reçus par ledit dispositif, et/ou à établir desdits signaux de communication, destinés à être émis par ledit dispositif, dont les informations de commande sont fonction au moins des données relevées par lesdits moyens de détection. L'invention concerne également un ensemble de tels dispositifs de signalisation et une chaussée routière munie d'un tel ensemble. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/0967; G08G 1/095

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/0967 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/096716 (2013.01); G08G 1/096758 (2013.01); G08G 1/096783 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1071059 A1 20010124; EP 1071059 B1 20040331; DE 60009399 D1 20040506; FR 2796745 A1 20010126; FR 2796745 B1 20021018

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PHF-CREATION S.A.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050731

2007-05-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070330

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050722

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-07-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-09-09 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040909

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-08-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-07-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040721

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60009399

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2003-09-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 08G 1/0967 A

2003-09-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 08G 1/095 B

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR GB IT

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI