Global Patent Index - EP 1071065 A2

EP 1071065 A2 2001-01-24 - Web support assembly

Title (en)

Web support assembly

Title (de)

Bahnstützvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Ensemble de support de bande

Publication

EP 1071065 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00306253 A

Priority

GB 9916940 A

Abstract (en)

A web support assembly (10) in which a web (11) is releasably secured to a poster board (12) via a jointing arrangement (13,17). The jointing arrangement (13,17) comprises an adhesive (16) secured to an abhesive material (17). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 15/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1071065 A2 20010124; EP 1071065 A3 20010425; GB 9916940 D0 19990922

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060201

2002-07-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010719

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI