Global Patent Index - EP 1071065 A3

EP 1071065 A3 2001-04-25 - Web support assembly

Title (en)

Web support assembly

Title (de)

Bahnstützvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Ensemble de support de bande

Publication

EP 1071065 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00306253 A

Priority

GB 9916940 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1071065A2] A web support assembly (10) in which a web (11) is releasably secured to a poster board (12) via a jointing arrangement (13,17). The jointing arrangement (13,17) comprises an adhesive (16) secured to an abhesive material (17). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 15/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1071065 A2 20010124; EP 1071065 A3 20010425; GB 9916940 D0 19990922

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060201

2002-07-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010719

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI