Global Patent Index - EP 1071101 A1

EP 1071101 A1 2001-01-24 - Magnetic component

Title (en)

Magnetic component

Title (de)

Magnetisches Bauelement

Title (fr)

Composant magnétique

Publication

EP 1071101 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00202555 A

Priority

DE 19934767 A

Abstract (en)

The component comprises at least two series-connected windings (13,14) arranged on a core (10,11) such that the leakage magnetic fields generated by the flow of current through the windings is at least partially compensated. The core consists of at least one inner limb and at least two outer limbs. The windings are arranged on the inner limb and/or the outer limbs. The individual windings may have the same inductances.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein magnetisches Bauelement mit mindestens zwei elektrisch in Reihe geschalteten Wicklungen (3, 4, 13, 14, 24-27, 31-33) und mit einem Kern (1, 2, 10, 11, 20-23, 30), auf dem die Wicklungen (3, 4, 13, 14, 24-27, 31-33) so angeordnet sind, daß sich bei einem Stromfluß durch die Wicklungen (3, 4, 13, 14, 24-27, 31-33) die erzeugten magnetischen Streufelder außerhalb des Bauelements wenigstens teilweise kompensieren, wobei der Kern mindestens ein Innenschenkelteil und mindestens zwei Außenschenkelteile aufweist und daß die Wicklungen (3, 4, 13, 14, 24-27, 31-33) auf dem Innenschenkelteil und/oder den Außenschenkelteilen angeordnet sind. Das erfindungsgemäße magnetische Bauelement ist beispielsweise für den Einsatz in Schaltnetzteilen vorgesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 3/10 (2006.01); H01F 5/00 (2006.01); H01F 27/24 (2006.01); H01F 27/34 (2006.01); H01F 27/42 (2006.01); H01F 30/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/346 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] NL 65173 C
  • [A] GB 748230 A 19560425 - WAYNE KERR LAB LTD, et al
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 205 (E - 420) 17 July 1986 (1986-07-17)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 507 (E - 0998) 6 November 1990 (1990-11-06)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 01 31 January 1996 (1996-01-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 01 30 January 1998 (1998-01-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1071101 A1 20010124; DE 19934767 A1 20010125; JP 2001068353 A 20010316; US 6657529 B1 20031202

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060801

2007-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040819

2004-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040819

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010724

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI