Global Patent Index - EP 1071114 A1

EP 1071114 A1 2001-01-24 - Lighting device

Title (en)

Lighting device

Title (de)

Leuchteinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'éclairage

Publication

EP 1071114 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99114339 A

Priority

EP 99114339 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has an incandescent coil (2) or a similar device positioned in a bulb (1) with an essentially cylindrical or oval wall. A heat resistant, infrared-transmissive filter (5) mounted on one end (4) of the bulb extends at least in areas over the end and is especially mounted vacuum-tight to the bulb wall so that the infrared component of the radiation generated can reach the end of the bulb via the filter

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Leuchteinrichtung, umfassend eine Glühwendel (2) oder dergleichen Glühmittel, die in einem Kolben positioniert ist, wobei der Kolben (1) eine im wesentlichen zylindrische oder ovale Wandung (3) aufweist. An einer Stirnseite (4) des Kolbens (1) ist ein für die IR-Strahlung durchlässiger und hitzebeständiger Filter (5) vorgesehen, der sich zumindest bereichsweise über die Stirnseite (4) erstreckt und insbesondere vakuumdicht an der Wandung (3) des Kolbens (1) angeordnet ist, derart, daß der IR-Anteil der erzeugten Strahlung über den Filter (5) stirnseitig aus dem Kolben (1) austreten kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01K 1/28; H01K 1/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01K 1/32 (2006.01); H01K 1/28 (2006.01); H01K 1/30 (2006.01); H01K 1/36 (2006.01); H01K 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01K 1/28 (2013.01); H01K 1/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1071114 A1 20010124; JP 2001076685 A 20010323

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041005

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040323

2002-02-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2001-11-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH LI

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010608

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI