Global patent index - EP 1071152 A1

EP 1071152 A1 2001-01-24 - Method for arranging elliptic cylindrical cell and assembled battery

Title (en)

Method for arranging elliptic cylindrical cell and assembled battery

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Anordnung elliptischer zylindrischer Zellen und so hergestellte Batterie

Title (fr)

Procédé de montage de piles elliptiques cylindriques et batterie ainsi obtenue

Publication

EP 1071152 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00115754 A

Priority

JP 20746999 A

Abstract (en)

In a method for arranging cells, a plurality of cells of an elliptic cylindrical shape each configured in an substantially elliptic cylindrical shape having a major axis and a minor axis in its sectional shape, and the sectional surface including the major axis of each of the lid wall and the bottom wall of each of the cells is inclined with respect to a vertical line perpendicular to an arrangement reference surface. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01M 10/04; H01M 2/10; H01M 6/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60L 11/18 (2006.01); H01M 2/10 (2006.01); H01M 6/42 (2006.01); H01M 10/04 (2006.01); H01M 10/60 (2014.01); H01M 10/613 (2014.01); H01M 10/625 (2014.01); H01M 10/64 (2014.01); H01M 10/647 (2014.01); H01M 10/6561 (2014.01); H01M 6/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01M 6/42 (2013.01); H01M 2/1083 (2013.01); H01M 10/04 (2013.01); H01M 10/613 (2015.04); H01M 10/625 (2015.04); H01M 10/64 (2015.04); H01M 10/651 (2015.04); H01M 10/6562 (2015.04); H01M 6/10 (2013.01); H01M 10/647 (2015.04); H01M 10/6566 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1071152 A1 20010124; CN 1208865 C 20050629; CN 1282116 A 20010131; JP 2001035461 A 20010209; JP 4355868 B2 20091104; KR 20010039734 A 20010515; US 6495282 B1 20021217

INPADOC legal status

2007-06-27 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20070516

2006-05-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GS YUASA CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010618

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI