Global Patent Index - EP 1071168 A2

EP 1071168 A2 2001-01-24 - Support system, in particular for electrical components

Title (en)

Support system, in particular for electrical components

Title (de)

Trägersystem, insbesondere für elektrische Bauteile

Title (fr)

Système de support, en particulier pour des composants électriques

Publication

EP 1071168 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00115319 A

Priority

DE 19933929 A

Abstract (en)

The carrier system includes at least one carrier part comprising at least one outer part (10) into which at least one inner part (12) can be inserted, the inner part being movable between an initial position and a final position relative to the outer part. An operating member (20) sequentially moves the inner part in at least two different directions relative to the outer part. The directions may be at right angles to each other. An operating member is also claimed.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Trägersystem, insbesondere für elektrische Bauteile, mit wenigstens einem Trägerelement, das zumindest ein Außenteil und zumindest ein in das Außenteil einsetzbares Innenteil umfaßt, das zwischen einer Ausgangslage und einer vorbestimmten Endlage relativ zum Außenteil bewegbar ist, und mit wenigstens einem Betätigungselement zum Bewegen des Innenteils, wobei das Innenteil mittels des Betätigungselementes nacheinander in wenigstens zwei unterschiedlichen Richtungen relativ zum Außenteil bewegbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/629

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/24 (2006.01); H01R 13/436 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/4362 (2013.01); H01R 9/2491 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1071168 A2 20010124; EP 1071168 A3 20020417; DE 19933929 A1 20010125

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071016

2007-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070604

2003-01-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2002-08-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020604

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-04-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 13/629 A, 7H 01R 13/436 B

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI