Global Patent Index - EP 1071172 A2

EP 1071172 A2 2001-01-24 - Electrical connector with component package

Title (en)

Electrical connector with component package

Title (de)

Elektrischer Steckverbinder mit elektrischen Bauelementen

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique contenant des composants électriques

Publication

EP 1071172 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00114064 A

Priority

US 36020599 A

Abstract (en)

An electrical connector such as a modular jack receives a component package (202) having a plurality of first conductive elements and at least one electrical device electrically coupled to the first conductive elements. The electrical connector has an insulative housing with an interior and an insulative insert with a forward portion and a rear portion. The rear portion defines a recess (100) for receiving the component package (202) therein, and the insert (72) is mounted within the interior of the housing (10). A plurality of first contacts (212) are mounted to the forward portion of the insert (72) for electrically contacting conductors in a mating connector inserted into the electrical connector. Each first contact (212) extends from the forward portion of the insert (72) to the recess and terminates at a termination in communication with the recess (100). The termination of each first contact (212) electrically contacts a corresponding first conductive element of the component package (202) as received in the recess (100). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/719

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/66 (2006.01); H01R 13/518 (2006.01); H01R 13/719 (2011.01); H01R 24/00 (2006.01); H01R 24/62 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/719 (2013.01); H01R 24/62 (2013.01); Y10S 439/941 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1071172 A2 20010124; EP 1071172 A3 20020417; CA 2313499 A1 20010123; CA 2313499 C 20080205; JP 2001068222 A 20010316; KR 100723550 B1 20070531; KR 20010015409 A 20010226; US 6276968 B1 20010821

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130129

2011-05-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FCI

2008-02-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080117

2003-01-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021004

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI