Global patent index - EP 1071173 A2

EP 1071173 A2 2001-01-24 - Terminal crimping quality decision method/device and frictional wear state detection method of crimping die

Title (en)

Terminal crimping quality decision method/device and frictional wear state detection method of crimping die

Title (de)

Anordnung und Verfahren zur Prüfung der Crimpqualität von Kontakten sowie Verfahren zur Besimmung des Reibungsverschleisses der Crimpmatritze

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé d'essai de la qualité de sertissage des bornes et procédé de détection de l'état d'usure de friction des matrices de sertissage

Publication

EP 1071173 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00115749 A

Priority

JP 20873999 A

Abstract (en)

The terminal crimping quality decision device determines the quality of a terminal crimped on a core of an electrical cable by a terminal crimping apparatus. The device uses a characteristic value envelop obtained when the terminal is crimped on the core. A reference value envelop is obtained from a characteristic value envelop obtained when a terminal is correctly crimped on the core. An increment envelop of the reference value envelop is calculated to obtain at least one singular point of the reference value envelop. The quality of a terminal crimped by the terminal crimping apparatus based on a characteristic value envelop of the crimped terminal. The characteristic value envelop is obtained in an envelop division separated by the singular point. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 43/048

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01R 31/00 (2006.01); H01R 43/048 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/0488 (2013.01); H01R 43/0486 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE LI PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1071173 A2 20010124; EP 1071173 A3 20020403; EP 1071173 B1 20050525; CZ 20002697 A3 20010516; CZ 298822 B6 20080213; DE 60020304 D1 20050630; DE 60020304 T2 20060504; JP 2001035629 A 20010209; JP 3627212 B2 20050309; PT 1071173 E 20050930; TR 200002112 A2 20010221

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150717

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-05-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060228

2005-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Effective date: 20050729

2005-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2005-06-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60020304

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-06-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-06-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2005-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-05-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI PT

2004-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040225

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE LI PT

2002-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020611

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI PT

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI