Global Patent Index - EP 1071174 A2

EP 1071174 A2 2001-01-24 - Terminal crimping quality decision method/device

Title (en)

Terminal crimping quality decision method/device

Title (de)

Anordnung und Verfahren zur Prüfung der Crimpqualität von Kontakten

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé d'essai de la qualité de sertissage des bornes

Publication

EP 1071174 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00115750 A

Priority

JP 20873899 A

Abstract (en)

The terminal crimping quality decision method/device determines the crimping quality of a terminal crimped to a conductor of an electrical cable by a terminal crimping apparatus. The method uses an envelop of characteristic values obtained when the terminal is crimped to the conductor. The characteristic values are obtained by sensing the deflection of a construction member constituting the terminal crimping apparatus and deflected by a reaction force caused by the crimping. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 43/048

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/048 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/0486 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE LI PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1071174 A2 20010124; EP 1071174 A3 20010829; EP 1071174 B1 20050223; DE 60018233 D1 20050331; DE 60018233 T2 20060112; JP 2001035628 A 20010209; PT 1071174 E 20050531; TR 200002154 A2 20010821; TR 200002154 A3 20010821

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-02-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051124

2005-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2005-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20050408

2005-03-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60018233

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-03-31

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI PT

2004-09-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ISHIBASHI, TERUYUKI C/O YAZAKI PARTS CO., LTD.

2004-09-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TOMIKAWA, KAZUYOSHI C/O YAZAKI PARTS CO., LTD.

2004-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040225

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE LI PT

2002-05-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020228

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI