Global patent index - EP 1071232 A1

EP 1071232 A1 2001-01-24 - Stereo multiplex-signal transmission with one single sideband modulation of the stereo-difference signal for frequency modulated broadcast system

Title (en)

Stereo multiplex-signal transmission with one single sideband modulation of the stereo-difference signal for frequency modulated broadcast system

Title (de)

Stereo-Multiplex-Signalübertragung mit einer Einseitenbandmodulation des Stereo-Differenzsignals für frequenzmodulierten Rundfunksystem

Title (fr)

Transmission de signaux stéréo multiplexés avec une modulation à bande latérale unique du signal différence stéréo pour système de radiodiffusion en modulation de fréquence

Publication

EP 1071232 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99114353 A

Priority

EP 99114353 A

Abstract (en)

To increase the signal to noise ratio of a frequency-demodulated stereo audio signal the stereo-multiplex signal at the transmitter side is modified so that the information of the stereo-difference signal is carried in only one sideband of the amplitude modulated stereo-difference signal, preferably in the lower sideband. Therefore, receivers which generate the stereo-difference signal on basis of only the lower sideband produce a higher signal to noise ratio of the frequency demodulated stereo audio signal than conventional FM-stereo receivers, because the noise bandwidth is reduced and in case only the lower sideband carries the information of the stereo-difference signal also the noise power spectral density is reduced. Conventional FM-stereo-receivers reproduce the modified stereo-multiplex signal without increase or decrease in quality. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/48 (2008.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

H04H 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/48 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1071232 A1 20010124

INPADOC legal status

2009-07-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20090109

2008-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20080829

2007-06-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SONY DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-09-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SONY DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010622

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI