Global Patent Index - EP 1071327 A1

EP 1071327 A1 2001-01-31 - AUTOANTIGENIC FRAGMENTS, METHODS AND ASSAYS

Title (en)

AUTOANTIGENIC FRAGMENTS, METHODS AND ASSAYS

Title (de)

AUTOANTIGENFRAGMENTE, VERFAHREN UND ASSAYS

Title (fr)

FRAGMENTS AUTO-ANTIGENES, METHODES ET DOSAGES

Publication

EP 1071327 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99919952 A

Priority

  • US 9908774 W
  • US 8264398 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9953757A1] The present invention provides a method of producing autoantigens, compositions comprising autoantigenic fragments and methods of using autoantigenic fragments in the treatment of a condition associated with an autoimmune response. Also provided are assays for the detection or assessment of an autoimmune response.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01N 37/18; A61K 39/00; C12P 21/04; G01N 33/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/53 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/06 (2006.01); C12P 21/04 (2006.01); C12P 21/06 (2006.01); G01N 33/564 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/564 (2013.01); C12P 21/06 (2013.01); G01N 2333/96436 (2013.01); G01N 2500/20 (2013.01); G01N 2800/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9953757 A1 19991028; AU 3755199 A 19991108; CA 2329495 A1 19991028; EP 1071327 A1 20010131; EP 1071327 A4 20040929; JP 2002511494 A 20020416

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061005

2006-10-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MERCK & CO., INC. (A NEW JERSEY CORP.)

2006-10-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JOHNS HOPKINS UNIVERSITY

2006-10-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MERCK FROSST CANADA LTD.

2004-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041004

2004-09-29 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040816

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001122

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20001122;LT PAYMENT 20001122;LV PAYMENT 20001122;MK PAYMENT 20001122;RO PAYMENT 20001122;SI PAYMENT 20001122