Global Patent Index - EP 1071333 A1

EP 1071333 A1 2001-01-31 - INDUCTION OF IMMUNITY AGAINST TUMOR SELF-ANTIGENS

Title (en)

INDUCTION OF IMMUNITY AGAINST TUMOR SELF-ANTIGENS

Title (de)

INDUKTION VON IMMUNITÄT GEGEN TUMOR-AUTOANTIGENE

Title (fr)

INDUCTION DE L'IMMUNITE CONTRE DES AUTOANTIGENES TUMORAUX

Publication

EP 1071333 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99912716 A

Priority

  • US 9906039 W
  • US 7888998 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9946992A1] This invention provides methods and compositions for breaking tolerance to a self-antigen, especially in the context of a tumor-associated antigen. In one embodiment, the method utilized altered tumor antigens or tumor antigens derived from heterologous species to break immunological tolerance and induce a cross-reactive immune response against the corresponding native or self-antigen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01N 63/00; A61K 38/02; A61K 39/00; C12N 5/06; C12N 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 5/06 (2006.01); A61K 35/12 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/04 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/0011 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01); A61K 2039/5154 (2013.01); A61K 2039/5156 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9946992 A1 19990923; AU 3102999 A 19991011; AU 758265 B2 20030320; CA 2322624 A1 19990923; EP 1071333 A1 20010131; EP 1071333 A4 20050223; JP 2002506618 A 20020305

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060510

2005-03-16 [16A] NEW DOCUMENTS DISCOVERED AFTER COMPLETION OF THE EP-SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 16A

- Effective date: 20050128

2005-03-09 [RA4] DATE AND KIND OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RA4

- Effective date: 20050120

2005-02-23 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20050110

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000920

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE