Global Patent Index - EP 1071344 A1

EP 1071344 A1 2001-01-31 - DEVICE FOR SELF-ROLLING CIGARETTES AND CORRESPONDING COMPONENTS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR SELF-ROLLING CIGARETTES AND CORRESPONDING COMPONENTS

Title (de)

CIGARETTEN-SELBSTVERFERTIGUNGSGERÄT UND BAUGRUPPEN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE CONFECTION PERSONNELLE DE CIGARETTES ET COMPOSANTS DUDIT APPAREIL

Publication

EP 1071344 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99910355 A

Priority

  • DE 19812644 A
  • EP 9901768 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19812644A1] The invention relates to a device for self-rolling cigarettes and its components, comprising a conveying device (30) for cigarettes or binders fitted with a lifting device (340, 342), a device for shaping a tobacco rod (20) fitted with a plucking roller (220), a tobacco-rod conveyor (10) fitted with a spring tappet (130, 150), and a binder-aligning device with a narrowable slit for introducing the binder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24C 5/42; A24C 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/02 (2006.01); A24C 5/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/02 (2013.01); A24C 5/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9948389A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19812644 A1 19990930; DE 19812644 C2 20021031; AT 217497 T 20020615; AT 255336 T 20031215; AU 2933999 A 19991018; AU 741234 B2 20011129; CA 2321917 A1 19990930; CA 2321917 C 20081028; CN 1122461 C 20031001; CN 1294499 A 20010509; EP 1071344 A1 20010131; EP 1071344 B1 20020515; EP 1138214 A2 20011004; EP 1138214 A3 20021009; EP 1138214 B1 20031203; JP 2002507402 A 20020312; JP 3480928 B2 20031222; US 6739343 B1 20040525; WO 9948389 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status


2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020515

2003-11-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-05-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030218

2003-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030317

2003-03-17 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030317

2003-03-17 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030317

2003-01-08 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1071344E

2002-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021128

2002-10-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-16 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020816

2002-08-15 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020815

2002-08-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020815

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020720

2002-06-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901462 20020620

2002-06-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000830;LT PAYMENT 20000830;LV PAYMENT 20000830;MK PAYMENT 20000830;RO PAYMENT 20000830;SI PAYMENT 20000830

2002-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-05-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-15 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

2002-05-15 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020515

2002-05-15 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020515

2002-05-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020515

2002-05-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 217497 T 20020615

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010403

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000830

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000830;LT PAYMENT 20000830;LV PAYMENT 20000830;MK PAYMENT 20000830;RO PAYMENT 20000830;SI PAYMENT 20000830