Global Patent Index - EP 1071350 A1

EP 1071350 A1 2001-01-31 - UNIVERSAL POCKET-FOLDING ASSEMBLY

Title (en)

UNIVERSAL POCKET-FOLDING ASSEMBLY

Title (de)

UNIVERSELLE STAUCHFALZMASCHINE

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE UNIVERSEL DE PLIURE DE POCHE

Publication

EP 1071350 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99939153 A

Priority

  • IT 9900056 W
  • IT AN980019 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9945805A1] The present invention refers to a universal device for the support and movement of the blades used to fold the edges and corners of patch pockets, which is specifically used in the industrial sewing machines that are currently used today to sew the back pockets on jeans pants. Such device comprises a box-type frame housing all the actuators for the movement of the support means of the interchangeable folding blades.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41H 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41H 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41H 33/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9945805A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9945805 A1 19990916; AU 3273999 A 19990927; BR 9908184 A 20001024; CN 1135077 C 20040121; CN 1292654 A 20010425; DE 69902646 D1 20021002; EP 1071350 A1 20010131; EP 1071350 B1 20020828; IT 1305685 B1 20010515; IT AN980019 A1 19990826; IT AN980019 D0 19980226; JP 2002506139 A 20020226; TR 200002313 T2 20010122

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20030309

2003-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-06-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2003-03-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030309

2003-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Ref Legal Event Code: LTIE

- Effective date: 20020828

2002-12-11 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-11-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021129

2002-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69902646

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-02

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT

2002-08-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20000930;LT PAYMENT 20000930;LV PAYMENT 20000930;MK PAYMENT 20000930;RO PAYMENT 20000930;SI PAYMENT 20000930

2002-08-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-08-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020828

2002-08-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020828

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010504

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001004

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20000930;LT PAYMENT 20000930;LV PAYMENT 20000930;MK PAYMENT 20000930;RO PAYMENT 20000930;SI PAYMENT 20000930