Global Patent Index - EP 1071352 A1

EP 1071352 A1 2001-01-31 - TOOL FOR TREATING HAIR, APPLICATOR/HAIR-HOLDING ELEMENT, AND CORRESPONDING METHOD AND USE

Title (en)

TOOL FOR TREATING HAIR, APPLICATOR/HAIR-HOLDING ELEMENT, AND CORRESPONDING METHOD AND USE

Title (de)

WERKZEUG ZUR HAARBEHANDLUNG, APPLIKATOR-HAARERFASSUNGSELEMENT, VERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

INSTRUMENT A USAGE CAPILLAIRE, ELEMENT D'APPLICATION/DE PREHENSION DES CHEVEUX, PROCEDE ET UTILISATION CORRESPONDANTS

Publication

EP 1071352 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99907552 A

Priority

  • DE 19810595 A
  • EP 9900970 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19810595A1] A hair treatment tool, especially for shaping and/or drying hair, which can be connected to the air outlet of a hair care apparatus (2), comprises a number of hair contacting elements (3) with areas which can give off a cosmetic substance. The applicator hair contacting element and/or the cosmetic substance are arranged so that the cosmetic substance leaves the elements when the temperature exceeds room temperature and/or as a result of moisture or vibration.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 20/00; A45D 20/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 19/02 (2006.01); A45D 19/16 (2006.01); A45D 20/00 (2006.01); A45D 20/12 (2006.01); A45D 20/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 19/02 (2013.01); A45D 20/00 (2013.01); A45D 20/12 (2013.01); A45D 20/124 (2013.01); A45D 20/50 (2013.01); A45D 2200/207 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9945814A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19810595 A1 19990923; AT 239401 T 20030515; AU 2725699 A 19990927; EP 1071352 A1 20010131; EP 1071352 B1 20030507; ES 2199555 T3 20040216; JP 2002505897 A 20020226; WO 9945814 A1 19990916

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050212

2005-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040214

2005-02-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050213

2005-02-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050213

2004-12-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BRAUN G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-04-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040210

2004-03-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2199555 T3

2004-02-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040214

2004-02-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040213

2004-02-13 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040213

2004-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040129

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040128

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905467 P 20030612

2003-05-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LEMAN CONSULTING S.A.

2003-05-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CAUSTON, BRIAN EDWARD

2003-05-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOLE, PHILIP NORMAN

2003-05-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JUNG, ROBERT

2003-05-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROLF, WILFRIED

2003-05-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TAVERN, SYDNEY CHRISTOPHER

2003-05-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WICHLACZ, ALEXANDER

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010326

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000831

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL