Global patent index - EP 1071363 A1

EP 1071363 A1 2001-01-31 - EVACUATOR

Title (en)

EVACUATOR

Title (de)

ABSAUGEVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'EVACUATION

Publication

EP 1071363 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99917508 A

Priority

  • US 9908207 W
  • US 8212598 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9953833A1] An improved smoke evacuation system (10), a method for removing gaseous byproducts of surgical procedures, and noxious vapors from chemicals, is provided. The smoke, and vapor evacuation system includes a vacuum head (18) positioned at a surgical site or incorporated into a workstation. The vacuum head includes a plenum (28), a plenum support for preventing the plenum from collapsing when a vaccum or low pressure is established therein, and is adapted to facilitate the use of the system in a variety of surgical or commercial procedures at a variety of surgical sites or commercial workstations.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 5/00; A61M 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 15/007 (2013.01); A61M 1/008 (2013.01); A61B 2218/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9953833 A1 19991028; AU 3561299 A 19991108; AU 746015 B2 20020411; CA 2329439 A1 19991028; CA 2329439 C 20080617; EP 1071363 A1 20010131; EP 1071363 A4 20081022; IL 139085 D0 20011125; JP 2002512068 A 20020423; MX PA00010168 A 20030414; NZ 507608 A 20030228

INPADOC legal status

2010-09-01 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20100425

2009-12-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INNOVATIVE SURGICAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2009-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20090105

2008-10-22 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20080919

2001-04-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61M 1/00 A

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001110

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20001110;LT PAYMENT 20001110;LV PAYMENT 20001110;MK PAYMENT 20001110;RO PAYMENT 20001110;SI PAYMENT 20001110