Global Patent Index - EP 1071367 A1

EP 1071367 A1 2001-01-31 - MULTI-SLICE CEREBRAL BLOOD FLOW IMAGING WITH CONTINUOUS ARTERIAL SPIN LABELING MRI

Title (en)

MULTI-SLICE CEREBRAL BLOOD FLOW IMAGING WITH CONTINUOUS ARTERIAL SPIN LABELING MRI

Title (de)

MEHRSCHICHTIGE BILDERZEUGUNG DER ZEREBRALEN BLUTSTRÖMUNG MITTELS KONTINUIERLICHER SPIN-MARKIERTER, MAGNETISCHER KERNRESONANZ

Title (fr)

FORMATION D'IMAGES MULTICOUPE DE FLUX SANGUIN CEREBRAL PAR IMAGERIE PAR RESONANCE MAGNETIQUE DE MARQUAGE DE SPIN ARTERIEL EN CONTINU

Publication

EP 1071367 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99918519 A

Priority

  • US 9908087 W
  • US 8150698 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9952429A1] This invention is a method for multi-slice CBF imaging using continuous arterial spin labeling (CASL) with an amplitude modulated control which is both highly effective at controlling for off resonance effects, and efficient at doubly inverting inflow spins, thus retaining the signal advantages of CASL versus pulsed ASL techniques.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 5/055

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 5/055 (2006.01); A61B 5/026 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 5/055 (2013.01); A61B 5/026 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9952429 A1 19991021; EP 1071367 A1 20010131; EP 1071367 A4 20020807

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050130

2004-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040929

2002-08-07 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020625

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-07-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61B 5/055 A, 7G 01R 33/563 B

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000927

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE