Global Patent Index - EP 1071424 A1

EP 1071424 A1 2001-01-31 - COMPOSITION COMPRISING L-CARNITINE OR AN ALKANOYL L-CARNITINE AND NADH AND/OR NADPH

Title (en)

COMPOSITION COMPRISING L-CARNITINE OR AN ALKANOYL L-CARNITINE AND NADH AND/OR NADPH

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT L-CARNITIN ODER EINEM ALKANOYL-L-CARNITIN, UND NADH UND/ODER NADPH

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION COMPRENANT DE LA L-CARNITINE OU UN ALCANOYL L-CARNITINE ET NADH ET/OU NADPH

Publication

EP 1071424 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99916039 A

Priority

  • IT 9900088 W
  • IT RM980238 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9953921A1] A composition is disclosed which comprises L-carnitine or an alkanoyl L-carnitine or the pharmacologically acceptable salt thereof and NADH and/or NADPH, useful as a dietary supplement for individuals engaging in strenuous physical exercise or asthenic subjects and, as a medicament, for treating the chronic fatigue syndrome and Parkinson's disease.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/455; A61K 31/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/455 (2006.01); A61K 31/205 (2006.01); A61K 31/70 (2006.01); A61K 31/7084 (2006.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01); A61P 3/02 (2006.01); A61P 21/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/16 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 45/06 (2013.01); A61K 31/455 (2013.01); A61K 31/70 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 45/06 + A61K 31/70 + A61K 31/22
  2. A61K 45/06 + A61K 31/70 + A61K 31/205
  3. A61K 31/455 + A61K 2300/00
  4. A61K 31/70 + A61K 2300/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9953921A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9953921 A1 19991028; AU 3442899 A 19991108; AU 750645 B2 20020725; BR 9909712 A 20001226; CA 2328331 A1 19991028; CN 1299283 A 20010613; EE 200000601 A 20020415; EP 1071424 A1 20010131; HU 0101914 A2 20020328; HU 0101914 A3 20021228; IL 139014 D0 20011125; IS 5663 A 20001013; IT 1299161 B1 20000229; IT RM980238 A1 19991018; IT RM980238 D0 19980417; JP 2002512191 A 20020423; NO 20005128 A 20001218; NO 20005128 D0 20001012; PL 343482 A1 20010827; SK 15442000 A3 20010611; TR 200002894 T2 20010122

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030618

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/455 A

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/70 B

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61P 25/16 B

2003-03-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: USE OF A COMPOSITION COMPRISING L-CARNITINE OR AN ALKANOYL L-CARNITINE AND NADH AND/OR NADPH FOR THE TREATMENT OF PARKINS

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/455 A

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/70 B

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61P 25/16 B

2003-01-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: USE OF A COMPOSITION COMPRISING L-CARNITINE OR AN ALKANOYL L-CARNITINE AND NADH AND/OR NADPH FOR THE TREATMENT OF PARKINS

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010822

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001023

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20001023;LT PAYMENT 20001023;LV PAYMENT 20001023;MK PAYMENT 20001023;RO PAYMENT 20001023;SI PAYMENT 20001023