Global Patent Index - EP 1071432 A1

EP 1071432 A1 2001-01-31 - COMPOSITION FOR AND TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATORY BOWEL DISEASE BY ORAL AND RECTAL ADMINISTRATION OF N-ACETYLGLUCOSAMINE

Title (en)

COMPOSITION FOR AND TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATORY BOWEL DISEASE BY ORAL AND RECTAL ADMINISTRATION OF N-ACETYLGLUCOSAMINE

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ENTZÜNDLICHEN DARMERKRANKUNGEN MITTELS ORALER UND REKTALER VERABREICHUNG VON N-ACETYLGLUCOSAMINE

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION ET METHODE PERMETTANT DE TRAITER LES AFFECTIONS INFLAMMATOIRES DE L'INTESTIN PAR ADMINISTRATION ORALE ET RECTALE DE N-ACETYLGLUCOSAMINE

Publication

EP 1071432 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99907220 A

Priority

  • CA 9900218 W
  • CA 2234936 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2234936A1] This invention relates to a novel composition and a novel method of treating inflammatory bowel disease (IBD). More particularly, this invention pertains to a novel composition containing N-acetyl-glucosamine (NAG) as an active IBD treating agent and a pharmacologically suitable carrier, and a method of administering the composition to the colon to treat IBD in a person afflicted with IBD. A composition for treating inflammatory bowel disease in a patient suffering from inflammatory bowel disease comprising: (a) a therapeutic amount of N-acetyl-glucosamine; and (b) a pharmacologically acceptable carrier, adapted to be administered colonically to said patient.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/70; A61K 9/00; A61K 9/02; A61P 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/00 (2006.01); A61K 9/02 (2006.01); A61K 9/08 (2006.01); A61K 31/7008 (2006.01); A61K 47/10 (2006.01); A61K 47/14 (2006.01); A61K 47/32 (2006.01); A61K 47/36 (2006.01); A61K 47/44 (2006.01); A61P 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/02 (2013.01); A61K 9/0031 (2013.01); A61K 31/7008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9953929A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

CA 2234936 A1 19991017; CA 2234936 C 20040629; CZ 20003846 A3 20020313; EP 1071432 A1 20010131; HU 0101514 A2 20011128; HU 0101514 A3 20030728; IL 139072 D0 20011125; JP 2002512195 A 20020423; NO 20005223 A 20001120; NO 20005223 D0 20001017; PL 343634 A1 20010827

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040910

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/70 A

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 9/00 B

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 9/02 B

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 1/04 B

2004-05-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: COMPOSITION FOR AND TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATORY BOWEL DISEASE BY ORAL AND RECTAL ADMINISTRATION OF N-ACETYLGLUCOSAMINE

2004-04-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/70 A

2004-04-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 9/00 B

2004-04-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 9/02 B

2004-04-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 1/04 B

2001-12-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011102

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001102

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL