Global Patent Index - EP 1071436 A1

EP 1071436 A1 2001-01-31 - IMMUNE EFFECTOR CELL HYBRIDS

Title (en)

IMMUNE EFFECTOR CELL HYBRIDS

Title (de)

HYBRIDE IMMUN-EFFEKTORZELLEN

Title (fr)

HYBRIDES DE CELLULES EFFECTRICES IMMUNES

Publication

EP 1071436 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99903347 A

Priority

  • US 9901464 W
  • US 8835798 P
  • US 8004198 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9937313A1] This invention provides a substantially pure population of educated, antigen-specific immune effector cells expanded in culture at the expense of hybrid cells, wherein the hybrid cells are antigen presenting cells (APCs) fused to cells that express one or more antigens and methods of using the population of cells.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/53 (2006.01); A61K 35/14 (2006.01); A61K 35/28 (2006.01); A61K 35/36 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/0011 (2013.01); A61K 2039/5152 (2013.01); A61K 2039/5154 (2013.01); A61K 2039/5156 (2013.01); A61K 2039/5158 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9937313 A1 19990729; AU 2339299 A 19990809; CA 2318987 A1 19990729; EP 1071436 A1 20010131; EP 1071436 A4 20030827; JP 2002500872 A 20020115; JP 2009195235 A 20090903

INPADOC legal status


2011-06-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20101218

2004-07-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GENZYME CORPORATION

2004-07-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DANA-FARBER CANCER INSTITUTE, INC.

2003-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030829

2003-08-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030715

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DANA-FARBER CANCER INSTITUTE, INC.

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000726

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE