Global Patent Index - EP 1071465 A1

EP 1071465 A1 2001-01-31 - AMORPHOUS GLASSES FOR STABILISING SENSITIVE PRODUCTS

Title (en)

AMORPHOUS GLASSES FOR STABILISING SENSITIVE PRODUCTS

Title (de)

AMORPHE GLÄSER ZUR STABILISIERUNG VON EMPFINDLICHEN PRODUKTEN

Title (fr)

VERRES AMORPHES POUR STABILISER DES PRODUITS SENSIBLES

Publication

EP 1071465 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99910516 A

Priority

  • GB 9900820 W
  • GB 9805699 A
  • GB 9820689 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9947174A1] Disclosed is a method of drying, without damage, a compound which is subject to deactivation on drying, or a mixture of such compounds, comprising subjecting an aqueous system containing the compound or mixture to drying in the presence of one or more monosaccharide sugar alcohols and at least one additive which is a glass-former or a glass-formation-facilitator, whereby the compound solidifies from solution as an amorphous glass rather than by forming crystals.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 47/26; A61K 47/22; A23L 1/275; A61K 7/00; A61K 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23L 1/09 (2006.01); A61K 9/00 (2006.01); A61K 47/02 (2006.01); A61K 47/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 47/26 (2013.01); A23L 29/37 (2016.08); A61K 9/0019 (2013.01); A61K 47/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9947174 A1 19990923; AU 2945199 A 19991011; EP 1071465 A1 20010131

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-02 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1034667

2004-10-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031201

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001011

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE