Global Patent Index - EP 1071502 A1

EP 1071502 A1 2001-01-31 - SOLIDS FILTER BASED ON QUARTZ SAND

Title (en)

SOLIDS FILTER BASED ON QUARTZ SAND

Title (de)

FESTKÖRPERFILTER AUF DER BASIS VON QUARZSAND

Title (fr)

FILTRE A SOLIDES A BASE DE SABLE SILICEUX

Publication

EP 1071502 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99915503 A

Priority

  • DE 9900602 W
  • DE 19809685 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19809685A1] The invention relates to a solids filter, especially for purifying hot media, comprising at least one filter layer made of quartz sand (SiO2) and a bonding agent, wherein the quartz sand has a defined granularity and the individual quartz sand particles are coated and bonded by a bonding agent to form at least one filter layer and the wall thickness of the filter is at the most 5mm. The invention also relates to a method for manufacturing said filter.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 39/20; B01D 46/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 39/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01D 39/2017 (2013.01); B01D 39/2041 (2013.01); B01D 39/2075 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9944721A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19809685 A1 19990909; DE 19809685 C2 20020620; AU 3407299 A 19990920; EP 1071502 A1 20010131; WO 9944721 A1 19990910

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-21 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20031007

2004-04-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031006

2003-07-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK LI

2002-07-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020524

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000929

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK LI