Global patent index - EP 1071516 A1

EP 1071516 A1 2001-01-31 - FOAM SPRAYING DEVICE

Title (en)

FOAM SPRAYING DEVICE

Title (de)

SCHAUMSPRÜHVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE PULVERISATION DE MOUSSE

Publication

EP 1071516 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99912000 A

Priority

  • CH 87998 A
  • IB 9900704 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9954054A1] The invention relates to a foam spraying device (1) for a liquid container, comprising an air suctioning device (20), a mixing chamber (14) for the air-liquid mixture and a spray head (2) with a foam outlet (9). A first piston-cylinder unit (20; 37) for the air and a second piston-cylinder unit (21; 38) for the liquid are provided between the spray head (2) and the liquid container. Each unit is fitted with an inlet (30; 44) and an outlet valve (31; 24) and are coupled in such a way that they cooperate with each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/76 (2006.01); B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B05B 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/3087 (2013.01); B05B 7/0037 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954054A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9954054 A1 19991028; WO 9954054 A9 20000217; AU 3049599 A 19991108; BR 9910127 A 20010109; CA 2328931 A1 19991028; CA 2328931 C 20040921; CN 1105605 C 20030416; CN 1297382 A 20010530; DE 59913081 D1 20060413; EP 1071516 A1 20010131; EP 1071516 B1 20060125; JP 2002512120 A 20020423; US 6547162 B1 20030415

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140418

2015-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-02-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-01-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59913081

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-11-26 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59913081

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-08-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130426

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130506

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130423

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130429

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: KELTUB B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20060430

2007-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20061026

2006-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-05-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20060502

2006-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59913081

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-04-13

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2006-01-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2006-01-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-04-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050225

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001116

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL