Global patent index - EP 1071520 A1

EP 1071520 A1 2001-01-31 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INHIBITING CORROSION OF METAL CONTAINERS AND COMPONENTS

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INHIBITING CORROSION OF METAL CONTAINERS AND COMPONENTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERHINDERUNG DER KORROSION VON METALLBEHÄLTERN UND KOMPONENTEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES DESTINES A EMPECHER LA CORROSION DES RECIPIENTS ET COMPOSANTS METALLIQUES

Publication

EP 1071520 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99916575 A

Priority

  • US 9907836 W
  • US 8109498 P
  • US 28937399 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9951362A1] A method and system for inhibiting corrosion of aluminum and other metal-containing components and structures exposed to water are disclosed. In one embodiment, the silicate solution is used as a test fluid medium for structural testing of aluminum-alloy or other metal container structures including propellant tanks (14), in which a structure filled with the medium is then subjected to various structural load testing. In another embodiment, the silicate solution is used as a test medium for proof pressure hydrostatic or load testing of launch vehicle (10) booster tanks. The silicate film (18) protects the underlying base metal surface against corrosion during these tests. The film (18) also protects the base metal surface in normal atmospheric conditions from exposure to humidity and other atmospheric moisture after removal of the test medium from the propellant tank (14) following completion of testing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 1/02; C11D 7/16; C23F 11/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 7/14 (2006.01); B64G 7/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/08 (2006.01); C23C 22/66 (2006.01); C23F 11/06 (2006.01); C23F 11/18 (2006.01); G01N 3/12 (2006.01); G01N 17/00 (2006.01); G06F 17/00 (2006.01); G01N 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 3/12 (2013.01); B64G 7/00 (2013.01); C23C 22/66 (2013.01); C23F 11/182 (2013.01); G01N 17/00 (2013.01); G01N 2203/0232 (2013.01); G01N 2203/024 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9951362 A1 19991014; AU 3486899 A 19991025; EP 1071520 A1 20010131; EP 1071520 A4 20030521; JP 2003521578 A 20030715

INPADOC legal status

2004-06-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031218

2003-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-05-21 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20030403

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 23F 11/18 A

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 01M 3/04 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 01N 3/12 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 02K 9/50 B

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001013

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR GB