Global patent index - EP 1071525 A1

EP 1071525 A1 2001-01-31 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR COATING AND SHAPING STRAND-SHAPED METALLIC MATERIAL BY DRAWING

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR COATING AND SHAPING STRAND-SHAPED METALLIC MATERIAL BY DRAWING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BESCHICHTEN UND UMFORMEN VON STRANGFÖRMIGEM METALLISCHEM UMFORMGUT MITTELS ZIEHEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'ENDUCTION ET DE DEFORMATION D'UNE MATIERE METALLIQUE EN FORME DE BARRE A DEFORMER PAR ETIRAGE

Publication

EP 1071525 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99920759 A

Priority

  • DE 19817088 A
  • EP 9902750 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19817088A1] Low pressure and high pressure lubricant chambers are arranged side by side, with drawing dies at the exit. The product (1) is coated with a lubricant using low-pressure and high-pressure lubricant chambers arranged side by side, and is drawn by dies positioned at the exit of these chambers. The lubricant in the low pressure chamber is in a solid to pasty state. The coated product entering into the high-pressure lubricant chamber is subjected to a combined pressure and temperature in such a way that the lubricant in this chamber is in a solid to liquid state. The apparatus includes the lubricant chambers (2, 3), an entry nozzle (4) for the product (1) into the lubricant chamber (2), drawing dies (5, 6), and a unit (7) for supply and pressurization of lubricant (8). The drawing die (5) also serves as an entry nozzle into the lubricant chamber (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 9/00; B21C 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 3/14 (2006.01); B21C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 9/00 (2013.01); B21C 3/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954066A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19817088 A1 19991028; DE 19817088 C2 20000217; AT 232429 T 20030215; AU 3821599 A 19991108; AU 754440 B2 20021114; CA 2327711 A1 19991028; CN 1296431 A 20010523; DE 59904278 D1 20030320; EP 1071525 A1 20010131; EP 1071525 B1 20030212; ES 2192847 T3 20031016; JP 2002512125 A 20020423; RU 2214876 C2 20031027; US 6430980 B1 20020813; WO 9954066 A1 19991028

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151103

2015-11-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59904278

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140527

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100415

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090428

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20081231

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070416

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070418

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070415

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ECOFORM UMFORMTECHNIK G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050430

2006-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20050416

2006-04-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060424

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060424

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050415

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ECOFORM UMFORMTECHNIK G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-16 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050416

2005-04-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050415

2005-04-15 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050415

2004-04-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040427

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-04-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040426

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-04-26 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040426

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-04-01 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040401

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-02-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2192847

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-09-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-06-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030509

2003-05-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59904278

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-03-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU SE

2003-02-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ECOFORM UMFORMTECHNIK GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011112

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001111

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU SE