Global Patent Index - EP 1071528 A1

EP 1071528 A1 2001-01-31 - MULTISTAGE METAL-FORMING MACHINE TOOL HAVING TOOL COMBINATION BLOCKS

Title (en)

MULTISTAGE METAL-FORMING MACHINE TOOL HAVING TOOL COMBINATION BLOCKS

Title (de)

MEHRSTUFIGE UMFORMMASCHINE MIT WERKZEUGKOMBIBLÖCKEN

Title (fr)

MACHINE-OUTIL A PLUSIEURS ETAGES TRAVAILLANT LE METAL PAR FORMAGE, MUNIE DE BLOCS COMBINES D'OUTILS

Publication

EP 1071528 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99907224 A

Priority

  • CH 9900123 W
  • CH 88498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9954071A1] The invention relates to a multistage metal-forming machine tool in which an apron (6) is screwed onto a pressing saddle (2). The apron (6) comprises six long-drawn tightening cams (62) which are arranged on the upper end of the apron and which are distributed over the width thereof. Four tightening tabs which project upward are placed on the lower end of the apron. A tool combination block (4) having a wedge-shaped supporting plate (42) is hung in the apron (6). Four tightening tabs (41) are configured on the upper end of the supporting plate (42) and are distributed over the width thereof, and four tightening cams are configured on the lower end. The tightening tabs (41) of the tool combination block (4) are hung over the tightening cams (62) of the apron (6), and the tightening cams (62) of the tool combination block (4) are inserted between the tightening tabs and the main part of the apron (6). A tightening force which is generated by two tightening devices (8) acts in a vertical direction toward the tool combination block (4). Said tightening force effects a tensioning of the tool combination block (4) and of the pressing saddle (2) in a horizontal direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21J 13/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21J 9/02 (2006.01); B21J 13/03 (2006.01); B30B 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21J 9/022 (2013.01); B21J 13/03 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954071A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9954071 A1 19991028; AU 2709699 A 19991108; CN 1094078 C 20021113; CN 1291121 A 20010411; CZ 20003821 A3 20010711; CZ 295233 B6 20050615; DE 59905653 D1 20030626; EA 002249 B1 20020228; EA 200001079 A1 20010423; EP 1071528 A1 20010131; EP 1071528 B1 20030521; ES 2196774 T3 20031216; JP 2002512127 A 20020423; JP 3563035 B2 20040908; KR 100400703 B1 20031008; TW 420627 B 20010201; UA 72454 C2 20001115; US 6658913 B1 20031209

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140323

2015-04-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150427

2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140322

2015-02-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140322

2015-01-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59905653

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-12-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141128

2014-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140322

2014-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-10-22 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59905653

2014-08-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2013-08-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130403

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130412

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130430

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130528

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120315

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130325

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130327

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120315

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: HATEBUR UMFORMMASCHINEN AG

- Free text: HATEBUR UMFORMMASCHINEN AG#GENERAL GUISAN-STRASSE 21#CH-4153 REINACH (CH) -TRANSFER TO- HATEBUR UMFORMMASCHINEN AG#GENERAL GUISAN-STRASSE 21#CH-4153 REINACH (CH)

2004-05-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040224

2003-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2196774 T3

2003-10-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905653 P 20030626

2003-06-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2003-06-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-05-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2003-05-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010508

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000721

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL