Global Patent Index - EP 1071562 A1

EP 1071562 A1 2001-01-31 - ERÄT

Title (en)

ERÄT

Title (de)

BEFESTIGUNGSWEISE FÜR MITTEL ZUM EMFANG VON GELOCHTEN BLÄTTERN AUF EINER REVERSIBLEN STRUKTUR UND ORDNER AUSGERÜSTET MIT DIESEM GERÄT

Title (fr)

MOYENS DE FIXATION DE MOYENS DE RECEPTION AMOVIBLES DE FEUILLES PERFOREES SUR UNE OSSATURE REVERSIBLE ET CLASSEUR EQUIPE DE CE DISPOSITIF

Publication

EP 1071562 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99904907 A

Priority

  • FR 9900356 W
  • FR 9802112 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2774945A1] The document file has a page binder with a base plate (22) and sprung hooks (24) to retain the pages. The base is held onto the cover of the file by a pin (30) which extends through the cover and base and is retained by a clip (20) at its end.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42F 13/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42F 13/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42F 13/406 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9942302A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

FR 2774945 A1 19990820; FR 2774945 B1 20000512; AU 2525099 A 19990906; DE 69901495 D1 20020620; DE 69901495 T2 20030116; EP 1071562 A1 20010131; EP 1071562 B1 20020515; ES 2177232 T3 20021201; WO 9942302 A1 19990826

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-01-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060901

2005-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040218

2005-02-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050225

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050131

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-10-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040217

2004-02-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-02-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040217

2003-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-05-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030218

2003-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030226

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-02-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030213

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2177232

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-09-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020816

2002-06-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69901495

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-06-20

2002-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-05-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020515

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010608

2001-06-27 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DEVICE FOR FIXING DETACHABLE MEANS RECEIVING PERFORATED SHEETS ON A REVERSIBLE STRUCTURE AND FOLDER EQUIPPED THEREWITH

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001121

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI