Global Patent Index - EP 1071588 A1

EP 1071588 A1 2001-01-31 - REVERSE ROTATION WIPER SYSTEM

Title (en)

REVERSE ROTATION WIPER SYSTEM

Title (de)

GEGENLAUFWISCHANLAGE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ESSUIE-GLACE A ROTATION ANTAGONISTE

Publication

EP 1071588 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99960814 A

Priority

  • DE 9903409 W
  • DE 19906933 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19906933A1] The wiper arm(54) for the driver's side(58) when in the parked position projects further in the wiping direction than the wiper arm(62) on the front seat passenger's side. In the parked position the wiper blade(96) for the driver's side lies over the wiper blade(98) for the passenger's side. The driver's side wiper arm with a right-hand drive configuration is axially symmetrical to the driver's side wiper arm with a left-hand drive configuration, and the same applies to the passenger's side wiper arm. The mountings and drive shafts are the same for right hand and left hand drive.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60S 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60S 1/28 (2006.01); B60S 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60S 1/0472 (2013.01); B60S 1/0422 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0048875A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19906933 A1 20000824; EP 1071588 A1 20010131; JP 2004516968 A 20040610; WO 0048875 A1 20000824

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-23 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080320

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040216

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010226

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE