Global Patent Index - EP 1071615 A1

EP 1071615 A1 2001-01-31 - TWO-PART MULTIFUNCTIONAL CLOSING SYSTEM FOR TUBES

Title (en)

TWO-PART MULTIFUNCTIONAL CLOSING SYSTEM FOR TUBES

Title (de)

ZWEITEILIGES MEHRFUNKTIONSCHLIESSELEMENT ZU TUBEN

Title (fr)

ELEMENT DE FERMETURE MULTIFONCTIONNEL A DEUX PARTIES, DESTINE A DES TUBES

Publication

EP 1071615 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98955819 A

Priority

  • HU 9800098 W
  • HU 9800106 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9954223A1] The invention relates to a two part multifunctional closing system for tubes. Said system is made of injection-molded plastic material and can be used particularly in containers (1) that are to be closed, preferably tubes and small bottles, especially those containing cream, salve or liquid material. Said system is tamper-proof and non-detachable and solves existing problems relating to the positioning of said systems. The closing element consists of a cylindrical bottom part (2) and an upper part (3) organically coupled by a flexible band (23) in such a way that the lower part (2) has a third cylindrical coating element (4) ending in a tubular dosing head (7) fitted with a thread on the inner jacket. A flange is formed above said coating element on the toothing (8) arranged on the outer jacket, which is inserted in the circular orifice (22) configured on the bottom part (2) of the closing element. The coating element is attached by a screw thread to free head part of the container (1) to be closed that is fitted with a thread. The top part (3) of the closing element has a tamper-proof element (20) having a wedge shape on its horizontal part and an U-shape suspending downwards from the opening and closing orifice (16) projecting downwards in the side opposite to the flexible band (23). Said tamper-proof element is attached to the two limbs by means of a tear-off point in the closing and opening orifice (16). The rotating wedge (10) formed on the top part (3) of the closing element prevents the material from smearing the surroundings of the mouth opening of the dosing head when the dosing head (7) is excessively bent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 47/08; B65D 55/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/08 (2006.01); B65D 55/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/0838 (2013.01); B65D 55/022 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954223A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9954223 A1 19991028; AT 240878 T 20030615; DE 59808500 D1 20030626; EP 1071615 A1 20010131; EP 1071615 B1 20030521; HU 1495 U 19990301; HU 9800106 V0 19980629

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-06-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-05-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-05-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040224

2003-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-11-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808500 P 20030626

2003-05-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-05-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: RO SI

2003-05-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-21 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-05-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-05-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030521

2001-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010122

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001102

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20001102;SI PAYMENT 20001102