Global patent index - EP 1071627 A1

EP 1071627 A1 2001-01-31 - REEL-UP

Title (en)

REEL-UP

Title (de)

WICKELMASCHINE

Title (fr)

BOBINEUSE

Publication

EP 1071627 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99910925 A

Priority

  • SE 9900394 W
  • SE 9800838 A
  • SE 9900460 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9947442A1] A reel-up for reeling a paper web onto reeling drums (2), comprising stand parts (5) with rails (9), along which the reeling drums (2), rotatably carried by their bearing housings (4), are displaced, a surface winding drum, over which the paper web runs and which is rotatably journalled in bearing housings (13) on the stand parts, a secondary system, and a primary system, having primary arms (24) with gripping members (33) for retaining a reeling drum (2), which primary arms have actuators (28) for moving the reeling drum (2) along the envelope surface of the surface winding drum. According to the invention, each primary gripping member has outer and inner locking arms (34, 35), pivotably journalled about a common journalling shaft (36) on the primary arm, a first actuator (44), carried by the gripping member to open and close the same by pivoting the outer locking arm (34) about the journalling shaft (36) in relation to the inner locking arm so as, in the open position, to receive the reeling drum and, in the closed position, retain the same in its bearing housings (4), and a second actuator (45), mounted between the primary arm and the inner locking arm (35). The outer and inner locking arms and the first actuator constitute a pivotable unit for regulating the linear load.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 18/26; B65H 18/16; B65H 19/22; B65H 19/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/26 (2006.01); B65H 19/22 (2006.01); B65H 19/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/2261 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41816 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41826 (2013.01); B65H 2408/236 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9947442A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9947442 A1 19990923; WO 9947442 A8 19991125; AT 247593 T 20030915; BR 9908860 A 20001031; CA 2322021 A1 19990923; CA 2322021 C 20031202; DE 69910556 D1 20030925; DE 69910556 T2 20040617; EP 1071627 A1 20010131; EP 1071627 B1 20030820; JP 2002506784 A 20020305; JP 3388231 B2 20030317; KR 100433771 B1 20040604; SE 511829 C2 19991206; SE 9900460 D0 19990212; SE 9900460 L 19990917

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130315

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120316

2012-10-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2012-06-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120313

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110314

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100315

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100315

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090325

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-08-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040524

2004-05-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-12-09 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69910556

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB IT SE

2003-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ANDERSSON, TOMMY, GOERAN

2003-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TUOMINEN, OLLI, MATTI

2003-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: OENNERLOEV, LARS-ERIK, ROLAND

2003-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MARKKANEN, VESA

2003-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PESONEN, RAIMO

2003-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PAETAERI, KAUKO

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020812

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: METSO PAPER KARLSTAD AKTIEBOLAG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000911

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB IT SE