Global Patent Index - EP 1071629 A1

EP 1071629 A1 2001-01-31 - HAND-HELD APPARATUS FOR TRANSFERRING A FILM FROM A CARRIER TAPE ONTO A SUBSTRATE

Title (en)

HAND-HELD APPARATUS FOR TRANSFERRING A FILM FROM A CARRIER TAPE ONTO A SUBSTRATE

Title (de)

HANDGERÄT ZUM ÜBERTRAGEN EINES FILMES VON EINEM TRÄGERBAND AUF EIN SUBSTRAT

Title (fr)

APPAREIL A MAIN PERMETTANT DE TRANSFERER SUR UN SUBSTRAT UN FILM APPLIQUE SUR UNE BANDE SUPPORT

Publication

EP 1071629 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99919241 A

Priority

  • DE 19816925 A
  • EP 9902546 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19816925A1] The spool components, each have at least one disc-form wall (13,15), and spool wall (13) of one component (4) is slotted to engage the wall (15) of the other (5) in the slot (14). Engaging wall has in the region of engagement a roughened surface. Supply spool (4), take-up spool (5) and application element (6) are provided in an exchangeable cassette (19) which is inserted from the rear into the housing through a corresponding fitting opening.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 35/07 (2006.01); B65H 37/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 37/007 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1348 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1795 (2013.01); Y10T 156/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954246A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IE IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19816925 A1 19991021; DE 19816925 B4 20091210; AU 3708399 A 19991108; AU 739619 B2 20011018; BR 9909698 A 20001219; CA 2328333 A1 19991028; CA 2328333 C 20080325; CN 1109646 C 20030528; CN 1298366 A 20010606; EP 1071629 A1 20010131; EP 1071629 B1 20021127; ES 2186353 T3 20030501; JP 2002512165 A 20020423; JP 4331897 B2 20090916; RU 2204523 C2 20030520; US 6363992 B1 20020402; WO 9954246 A1 19991028; ZA 200005398 B 20010829

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100416

2011-11-21 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111121

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100415

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100415

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100415

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090429

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090417

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090428

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090427

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-11-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-04-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050416

2005-01-12 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-09-24 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-06-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-04-21 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040421

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-04-15 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040415

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186353 T3

2003-04-23 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20030423

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-25 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-01-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IE IT SE

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020214

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001016

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IE IT SE