Global Patent Index - EP 1071633 A2

EP 1071633 A2 2001-01-31 - MANUALLY CONTROLLED LIFTING DEVICE WITH A PNEUMATIC LIFT DRIVE MECHANISM

Title (en)

MANUALLY CONTROLLED LIFTING DEVICE WITH A PNEUMATIC LIFT DRIVE MECHANISM

Title (de)

HANDGESTEUERTES HEBEGERÄT MIT EINEM PNEUMATISCHEN HUBANTRIEB

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE LEVAGE A COMMANDE MANUELLE, A COMMANDE DE LEVAGE PNEUMATIQUE

Publication

EP 1071633 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99913081 A

Priority

  • DE 9900472 W
  • DE 29802606 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6389950B1] A manually controlled lifting device is provided including a pneumatic lifting drive, a lifting member, a load carrying means, a pressure source, a pressure line, a flow control device, a pneumatic pressure switch and a vent drive. The lifting member is arranged on the pneumatic lifting drive and is a load transmitting component of at least two parts. The load carrying means is attached to the lifting member for carrying a load. The pressure line has a first end and a second end where the first end is in communication with the pressure source and the second end is in communication with the pneumatic lifting drive. The flow control device is in communication with the pressure line and integrated between the two parts of the load transfer component and the pressure source. The flow control device automatically varies a cross section of flow in the pressure line in relation to a load acting on the load carrying means. During a lifting operation a relatively larger cross section of flow is set during a high load and a relatively smaller cross section of flow is set during a lower load, while during a lowering operation a relatively smaller cross section of flow is set during a high load and a relatively larger cross section of flow is set during a lower load.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 13/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9941185A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29802606 U1 19980423; EP 1071633 A2 20010131; EP 1071633 A3 20021211; EP 1071633 B1 20020925; ES 2180288 T3 20030201; US 6389950 B1 20020521; WO 9941185 A2 19990819; WO 9941185 A3 20021024

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050217

2005-12-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050213

2005-10-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-02-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050217

2005-02-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050217

2005-02-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050216

2004-02-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040217

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-02-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040209

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-02-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040204

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-02-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040203

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040130

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2180288 T3

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2002-11-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902847 20021031

2002-10-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-25 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.

2002-05-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEMAG CRANES & COMPONENTS GMBH

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000801

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE